RI H6067 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adds airspace to the land the department of transportation can acquire that is necessary for a suitable airport or to preserve, maintain, or restore an approach. Additionally this act would add the term “Approach, approach zone, approaches” to § 1-2-3.1.
Title
Airports And Landing Fields
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |