RI H6065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the conditions of bail and recognizance to permit the release of a person charged with a misdemeanor without financial conditions.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6065.pdf |