RI H6051 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Relating To State Affairs And Government - Energy Facilities Siting Act (creates A 14 Member Special Legislative Study Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study/review Of The Energy Facility Siting Act, And Report Back To The House No Later Than 1/31/18, And Whose Life Would Expire On 6/2/18.)
Title
House Resolution Relating To State Affairs And Government - Energy Facilities Siting Act (creates A 14 Member Special Legislative Study Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study/review Of The Energy Facility Siting Act, And Report Back To The House No Later Than 1/31/18, And Whose Life Would Expire On 6/2/18.)
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Meeting postponed (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |