RI H6019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a comprehensive statutory scheme to address all aspects of noncompetition agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Noncompetition Agreement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-24HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/26/2019)
2019-05-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback