RI H5985 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates previous sections of the general laws and require that all proposed rules and regulations promulgated by state entities be submitted to and approved by the joint committee on regulatory oversight before becoming effective.
Title
Joint Committee On Regulatory Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5985.pdf |