RI H5966 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes efficiency standards for selected residential and commercial products.
Title
Appliance And Equipment Energy And Water Efficiency Standards Act Of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |