RI H5965 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces to three (3) years the residency requirement for the town of Burrillville's partial real estate tax exemption for the elderly.
Title
Enabling The Town Council Of The Town Of Burrillville To Exempt Certain Property From Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |