RI H5937 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of labor and training to recover overpayments made due to fraud committed by a claimant to certain individuals.
Title
Employment Security - Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2015) |
2015-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |