RI H5929 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an employer to require an employee to execute a nondisclosure agreement or non-disparagement agreement, regarding alleged violations of civil rights or criminal conduct, as a condition of employment.
Title
Fair Employment Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-04-04 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |