RI H5841 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the participation and input of the EOHHS, DHS, DCYF and BDHDDH in medical assistance and public assistance caseload estimating conferences and the generation of monthly data to the members of the caseload estimating conference.
Title
Medical Assistance And Public Assistance Caseload Estimating Conferences
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5841.pdf |