RI H5840 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows physician practices to maintain their license standards, even if a hospital system owns the practice.
Title
Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |