RI H5834 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an instant ticket scratch off game pilot program to raise funds for Rhode Island veterans and dependents of qualified service members.
Title
State Lottery
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5834.pdf |