RI H5830 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of a school district's listserv to distribute any political advertisement, invitation, and/or propaganda.
Title
Offenses Pertaining To Schools [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |