RI H5825 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires temporary disability contributions and benefits to be calculated based upon an employee's wages and salaries, that shall also include any sales commissions earned.
Title
Temporary Disability Benefits And Contributions
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5825.pdf |