RI H5823 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of containers, or food packaged in containers that contain bisphenol A.
Title
Prohibition Of Containers Using Bisphenol A
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5823.pdf |