RI H5822 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the secretary of state establish a registry for publication of municipal invitations for bids and that municipalities publish notice of invitations for bids with the registry.
Title
Department Of State -- Award Of Municipal Contracts
Sponsors
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5822.pdf |