RI H5813 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the time for an inspection of a new motor vehicle from two (2) years to seven (7) years.
Title
Inspection Of Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/18/2023) |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5813.pdf |