RI H5769 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the governor’s commission on disabilities in the decision making process for the disability parking enforcement enhancement program and requires an annual report be submitted to the governor’s commission.
Title
Parking Facilities And Privileges
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/17/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |