RI H5762 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands and clarifies what constitutes disability entitling disabled veterans to the waiver of motor vehicle registration fees.
Title
Registration Fees--disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5762.pdf |