RI H5744 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coverage for the treatment of pre-exposure prophylaxis (PrEP) for the prevention of HIV and post-exposure prophylaxis (PEP) to prevent HIV infection, commencing January 1, 2024.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5744.pdf |