RI H5730 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general to enter into a reciprocal agreement with Massachusetts and/or Connecticut for handgun permits.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5730.pdf |