RI H5700 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no educational institution without an opt-in shall compel students to participate in a take-home technology program (e.g., computers).
Title
Student Privacy On School-owned Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee transferred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5700.pdf |