RI H5688 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the town of Coventry from assessing the costs of repaving the roadway upon the completion of any sewage works upon the land owners.
Title
Relating To Coventry Sewer Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |