RI H5686 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sets standards for recognition of comprehensive stroke care centers.
Title
Stroke Care Centers
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2015-05-20 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/20/2015) |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2015) |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |