RI H5681 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exception to required school immunizations for pupils whose personal beliefs are contrary to immunization and/or testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offenses Pertaining To Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017)
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback