RI H5676 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Permit The Ri Parole Board To Revoke A Permit Issued By Another Jurisdiction When The Prisoner Is Being Supervised By The Ri Parole Board, And Require Return To The Adult Correctional Institution Of Such Person Whose Licenses Have Been So Revoked)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Permit The Ri Parole Board To Revoke A Permit Issued By Another Jurisdiction When The Prisoner Is Being Supervised By The Ri Parole Board, And Require Return To The Adult Correctional Institution Of Such Person Whose Licenses Have Been So Revoked)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5676.pdf |