RI H5674 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the first Green Justice Zone, a model that may be replicated in future years to ensure that all communities throughout the state have clean air and clean water.
Title
The Green Justice Zone Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5674.pdf |