RI H5672 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections - Conduct Of Elections And Voting Equipment And Supplies (would Allow Recount Of Mail Ballots And Precinct Cast Ballots Only Where There Is Competent Evidence Of Irregularities)
Title
An Act Relating To Elections - Conduct Of Elections And Voting Equipment And Supplies (would Allow Recount Of Mail Ballots And Precinct Cast Ballots Only Where There Is Competent Evidence Of Irregularities)
Sponsors
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5672.pdf |