RI H5660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the minimum wage for tipped workers by fifty cents ($.50) per year commencing on January 1, 2020 until the tipped minimum wage is not less than two-thirds (2/3) of the regular minimum wage.
Title
Minimum Wage--gratuities
Sponsors
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5660.pdf |