RI H5633 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Commission For Health Advocacy And Equity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Commission For Health Advocacy And Equity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-30 Signed by Governor
2011-06-29 Transmitted to Governor
2011-06-29 Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
2011-06-29 Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar
2011-06-28 House passed Sub A
2011-06-22 Placed on House Calendar
2011-06-22 Committee recommends passage of Sub A
2011-06-22 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-03-30 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2011-03-30 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-03-03 Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback