RI H5630 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an accident compensation fund to provide payments and benefits to those injured by uninsured motorists, to be administered by the department of human services.
Title
Automobile Accident Social Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5630.pdf |