RI H5625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the application fee for pharmacists to two hundred dollars ($200) annually.
Title
Relating To Businesses And Professions
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5625.pdf |