RI H5621 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a Medicaid home nursing care and hospice base rate adjustment for services delivered by highly skilled nursing professionals to high-acuity or high medical necessity Medicaid beneficiaries that have tracheostomies or use ventilators.
Title
Medical Assistance - Long-term Care Service And Finance Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5621.pdf |