RI H5613 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases committee in law enforcement officers’ bill of rights hearing to 5, three as permanent. Hearings commenced in 15 days, allow for summary suspension of 5 days and would mandate pay suspended while the case is pending.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5613.pdf |