RI H5590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts two 10 year statute of limitations on two separate tax functions.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes-enforcement And Collection
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. David Place [R] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |