RI H5560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the personal income tax rates, with the revenue collected therefrom to be deposited into a restricted receipt account for the purpose of reimbursement to municipalities for public school construction.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5560.pdf |