RI H5558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows those persons with concealed carry permits issued by other states to carry upon their person weapons in Rhode Island provided that the issuing state recognizes and gives reciprocity to RI permit holders.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5558.pdf |