RI H5547 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of elementary and secondary education to adopt a course of study on the nation's founding and related documents, including the Declaration of Independence, the United States Constitution, and the Federalist Papers.
Title
Civic Literacy
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5547.pdf |