RI H5536 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the laws regulating the aggregation of electrical loads by a municipality or group of municipalities; requires that at least one public hearing be held for review by its residents prior to adopting any plan; then approval by the PUC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Powers Of Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-05HouseSigned by Governor
2017-10-03HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-09-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017)
2017-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Commerce
2017-06-01HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-05-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/01/2017)
2017-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
2017-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017)
2017-03-13HouseMeeting postponed (03/15/2017)
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-13HouseMeeting postponed (03/14/2017)
2017-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-02-28HouseMeeting postponed (02/28/2017)
2017-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback