RI H5535 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a fund to be managed by the joint committee on legislative services, to make Rhode Island mementos available to visiting dignitaries and for gifts to hosting out-of-state officials, to be given by legislators' during official visits.
Title
Joint Committee On Legislative Services
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5535.pdf |