RI H5517 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that commencing with the graduating class of 2023 all high school students attending public schools demonstrate proficiency in computer science.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |