RI H5509 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Julia L. Aurigemma to join Kathryn Abbott DeNapoli and James Michael Mathews in marriage on or about May 20, 2017, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-03-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | House read and passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |