RI H5506 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires copies of auditor's documents relative to evaluation and opinion about fees to be filed with the Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation and be considered public records pursuant to chapter 2 of title 38, access to public records.
Title
Responsible Recycling, Reuse And Disposal Of Mattresses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-28 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |