RI H5501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that corporate motor vehicles would be included in the category of motor vehicles eligible for courtesy or special plates.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5501.pdf |