RI H5493 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates exceptions to the "revolving-door rule" and for persons holding senior policy making/discretionary/confidential staff positions with 5 years of uninterrupted state service.
Title
Code Of Ethics
Sponsors
Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5493.pdf |