RI H5491 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the council on elementary and secondary education, in consultation with the Rhode Island department of education, to develop and approve statewide academic standards for the instruction of consumer education in public high schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Literacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01HouseSigned by Governor
2021-05-25HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-25SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021)
2021-05-19SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-05-14SenateScheduled for consideration (05/19/2021)
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Education
2021-05-11HouseHouse read and passed
2021-04-30HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/11/2021)
2021-04-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-04-23HouseScheduled for consideration (04/28/2021)
2021-04-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021)
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback