RI H5468 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
This act would, upon its own motion or upon request of a parolee, enable the parole board to terminate a parolee's supervision and legal custody order. Prisoners with a life sentence for first and second degree murder are excluded.
Title
Parole
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |