RI H5467 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Cars Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Cars Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-20 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/20/2019) |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |