RI H5467 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/01/2017)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/01/2017)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides department of education shall not approve a new career and technical program or center in certain towns so long as a center is maintained by the Chariho regional school district.
Title
Establishment Of Regional School Districts - Chariho Career And Technical Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5467.pdf |