RI H5458 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raises amount from $1,500 to $3,000 at which insurer may fail to renew private passenger auto policy/assess premium surcharge for property damage claim payment. Eff. 1/1/20.
Title
Casualty Insurance Rating
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-06-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |